NJ A5054 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021; modifies terms and conditions for certain loan utilizing federal funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021; modifies terms and conditions for certain loan utilizing federal funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3211 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.22.
2020-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2020-12-17SenateSubstituted for S3211
2020-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-12-07AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-11-19AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3211 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A5054

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback