NJ S3211 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A5054
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021; modifies terms and conditions for certain loan utilizing federal funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes NJ Infrastructure Bank to expend additional sums to make loans for environmental infrastructure projects for FY2021; modifies terms and conditions for certain loan utilizing federal funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-17SenateSubstituted by A5054
2020-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-11-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5054 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.22.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback