NJ A5033 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.462.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.462.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes motor vehicle dealers to sell motor vehicles online and obtain electronic signatures for motor vehicle transactions.
Title
Authorizes motor vehicle dealers to sell motor vehicles online and obtain electronic signatures for motor vehicle transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3279 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3279 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.462. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-11-08 | Senate | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (38-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S3279 (1R) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3279 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A5033 (1R)