NJ A5019 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2996 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2996 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Board of Cosmetology Hairstyling licensees to operate mobile facilities when providing services.
Title
Allows Board of Cosmetology Hairstyling licensees to operate mobile facilities when providing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2996 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2996 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.275.