NJ S2996 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S775
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.275.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.275.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Board of Cosmetology Hairstyling licensees to operate mobile facilities when providing services.
Title
Allows Board of Cosmetology Hairstyling licensees to operate mobile facilities when providing services.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5019 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5019 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.275. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A5019 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2996 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.275.
A5019 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2996 (2R)
A5019 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2996 (2R)