NJ A5002 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases motor vehicle surcharge to fund "New Jersey Forensic DNA Laboratory Fund."
Title
Increases motor vehicle surcharge to fund "New Jersey Forensic DNA Laboratory Fund."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-27-1) |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3330 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading