NJ A5000 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.134.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to produce and maintain database concerning residential properties under foreclosure.**
Title
Requires DCA to produce and maintain database concerning residential properties under foreclosure.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3412 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3412 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.134. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S3412 (2R) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-3-3) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3412 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5000 (2R)