NJ S3412 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5000 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DCA to produce and maintain database and interactive map concerning residential properties under foreclosure; increases certain recording fees as funding mechanism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DCA to produce and maintain database and interactive map concerning residential properties under foreclosure; increases certain recording fees as funding mechanism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A5000 (2R)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5000 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.134.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback