NJ A4966 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain surgical technologists from general educational and training requirements.
Title
Exempts certain surgical technologists from general educational and training requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3334 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3334 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.226.