NJ A4954 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S544
Note: Carry Foward to future A3108
Note: Carry Over of previous S3281
Note: Carry Over of previous A4923
Note: Carry Foward to future A3108
Note: Carry Over of previous S3281
Note: Carry Over of previous A4923
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires female inmates be provided with family planning services prior to release from correctional facility.
Title
Requires female inmates be provided with family planning services prior to release from correctional facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4954 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4954 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3099 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3281 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4923 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4954 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3099 (Same As) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3281 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4923 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4954 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A5000/4954_I1.HTM |