NJ A4904 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns property taxes due and owing on real property owned by certain federal employees or contractors under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns property taxes due and owing on real property owned by certain federal employees or contractors under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3347 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18Senate2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2019-03-18SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2019-01-31AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2019-01-31SenateEmergency Resolution (37-0) (Cryan)
2019-01-31SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Cryan)
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted for S3347 (1R)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-1-0)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-28AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3347 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A4904 (1R)
S3349 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback