NJ A4861 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.300.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.300.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to publish total number of COVID-19 deaths and cases in long-term care facilities.
Title
Requires DOH to publish total number of COVID-19 deaths and cases in long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3041 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3041 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.300. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3041 (2R) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3041 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4861 (1R)