NJ A4854 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of Interstate Highway Route 295 in West Deptford Township as "State Trooper Sean E. Cullen Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates portion of Interstate Highway Route 295 in West Deptford Township as "State Trooper Sean E. Cullen Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S3244 |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3244 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.202.