NJ A4850 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A573

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes expedited construction inspection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes expedited construction inspection program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3095 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-08Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2021-11-08AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2021-11-08AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2021-06-03SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2021-06-03SenateSubstituted for S3095
2021-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
2020-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-10-19AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4850 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
S3095 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4850

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback