NJ A4790 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special "Equality" license plates.
Title
Establishes special "Equality" license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3406 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.279. |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S3406 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-5-6) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S3406 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4790