NJ A4717 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1426
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires firearm retailers to sell personalized handguns.
Title
Requires firearm retailers to sell personalized handguns.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] |
Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted by S3249 |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4717 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3249
S3249 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3249 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session