NJ A4708 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.94.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.94.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Farm Liaison in Department of Agriculture.
Title
Establishes Farm Liaison in Department of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3235 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.94. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3235 (1R) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3235 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4708 (1R)