NJ A4683 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3116 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3116 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain medical facilities to undertake end-of-life planning and training.*
Title
Requires certain medical facilities to undertake end-of-life planning and training.*
Sponsors
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3116 (3R) |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3116 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.420.