NJ A4679 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1904
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Commissioner of Education to develop sensitivity training program for high school athletic directors, coaches, and sports officials of interscholastic athletic sports programs.*
Title
Directs Commissioner of Education to develop sensitivity training program for high school athletic directors, coaches, and sports officials of interscholastic athletic sports programs.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-1) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4679 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3518 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3518 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee