NJ A4671 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.97.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.97.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public and local utilities to provide notice to residential customers of available relief measures during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Title
Requires public and local utilities to provide notice to residential customers of available relief measures during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3326 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3326 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.97. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (70-0-0) (Schaer) |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted for S3326 (1R) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3326 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A4671 (1R)