NJ A4652 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2332
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Public Health Counsel to promulgate rules and regulations for use of quality control programs in bio-analytical and clinical laboratories.*
Title
Requires Public Health Counsel to promulgate rules and regulations for use of quality control programs in bio-analytical and clinical laboratories.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3065 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for S3065 (1R) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-0-0) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4652 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3065 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4652 (1R)
S3065 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4652 (1R)