NJ A4623 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes process for Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to declare loan under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program as in default or rehabilitated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes process for Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to declare loan under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program as in default or rehabilitated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-01-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-22AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3149 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback