NJ A4554 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.169.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Approved P.L.2021, c.169.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes successor program to solar renewable energy certificate program in BPU, including solicitation process for certain solar power generation facilities.
Title
Establishes successor program to solar renewable energy certificate program in BPU, including solicitation process for certain solar power generation facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2605 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2605 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.169. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-12) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2605 (SCS/1R) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-16-2) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2605 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4554 (ACS)