NJ A4527 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates driver's license suspension for failure to pay parking tickets; requires registration suspension for more than five parking tickets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates driver's license suspension for failure to pay parking tickets; requires registration suspension for more than five parking tickets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-1-0)
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-08-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2841 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback