NJ A4520 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3048
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3048
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires candidates for President and Vice-President of United States to disclose federal income tax returns to appear on ballot; prohibits Electoral College electors from voting for candidates who fail to file income tax returns.*
Title
Requires candidates for President and Vice-President of United States to disclose federal income tax returns to appear on ballot; prohibits Electoral College electors from voting for candidates who fail to file income tax returns.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3048 |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4520 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3048
S3048 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S3048 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate