NJ A4415 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Director of Division of Investment to attempt to use qualified minority and women-owned financial institutions to provide brokerage and investment management services.
Title
Requires Director of Division of Investment to attempt to use qualified minority and women-owned financial institutions to provide brokerage and investment management services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted by S374 |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S374 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.2.
S3220 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3220 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee