NJ A4399 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.174.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Gold Star Family Counseling Program in DMVA; creates tax credit for certain health care professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Gold Star Family Counseling Program in DMVA; creates tax credit for certain health care professionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2858 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.174.
2017-06-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
2017-06-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-26SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2017-06-26SenateSubstituted for S2858 (2R)
2017-06-22SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Beach)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-01-19AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-12-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2858 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4399 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback