NJ S2858 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4399 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Gold Star Family Counseling Program in DMVA; creates tax credit for certain health care professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Gold Star Family Counseling Program in DMVA; creates tax credit for certain health care professionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26SenateSubstituted by A4399 (3R)
2017-06-22SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Beach)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-01-23SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-01-23SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-12-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4399 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.174.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback