NJ A4370 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-16 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Cunningham)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits retroactive modification of certain judgements of conviction, requires study of DOC's anticipated expenses to upgrade data infrastructure.***

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits retroactive modification of certain judgements of conviction, requires study of DOC's anticipated expenses to upgrade data infrastructure.***

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-16SenateSenate Amendment (23-0) (Cunningham)
2020-08-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-08-03SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (51-21-2)
2020-07-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-20AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-06-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2593 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Senate Amendment (23-0) (Cunningham)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback