NJ A4339 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.281.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.281.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Mom2Mom Peer Support Program" telephone helpline.
Title
Establishes "Mom2Mom Peer Support Program" telephone helpline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2918 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2918 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.281. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (32-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Cond. Veto Rec'd Assembly, 1st Reading/Governor Recommend. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2918 (1R) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2013-11-25 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2918 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A4339 (1R)