NJ A4310 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3058
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain appointee to retain civil service position if eligibility error was made by Civil Service Commission.
Title
Permits certain appointee to retain civil service position if eligibility error was made by Civil Service Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4310 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee