NJ A4286 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3443
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes transfer of excess medical marijuana inventory between alternative treatment centers.
Title
Authorizes transfer of excess medical marijuana inventory between alternative treatment centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-11-5) |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4286 (Carry Over) 2015-05-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2899 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2899 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee