NJ A4179 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2559 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2559 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for health insurance providers and Medicaid to cover services provided using telemedicine and telehealth; appropriates $5 million.
Title
Revises requirements for health insurance providers and Medicaid to cover services provided using telemedicine and telehealth; appropriates $5 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2559 (4R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2559 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.310.