NJ S2559 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.310.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.310.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for health insurance providers and Medicaid to cover services provided using telemedicine and telehealth; appropriates $5 million.
Title
Revises requirements for health insurance providers and Medicaid to cover services provided using telemedicine and telehealth; appropriates $5 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4179 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.310. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (35-0) |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4179/4200 (ACS/2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4179 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S2559 (4R)
A4200 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Combined with A4179 (ACS)
A4200 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Combined with A4179 (ACS)