NJ A4126 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires State Treasurer to submit report to Legislature every six months identifying deadlines for applications for federal funds by State agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires State Treasurer to submit report to Legislature every six months identifying deadlines for applications for federal funds by State agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2018-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2791 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback