NJ A4124 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.272.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.272.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public employers to implement certain policies for handling and responding to reports of domestic violence.
Title
Requires public employers to implement certain policies for handling and responding to reports of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2907 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.272. |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2907 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2907 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A4124