NJ A4081 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.169.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Charlie's Law"; Establishes civil penalties for persons who interfere with or deny persons with disabilities accompanied by service or guide dogs access to places of public accommodation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Charlie's Law"; Establishes civil penalties for persons who interfere with or deny persons with disabilities accompanied by service or guide dogs access to places of public accommodation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2662 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Rescind Vote (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Rescind Vote (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.169.
2017-06-19SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S2662 (1R)
2017-05-25SenateRescind Vote (38-0) (Allen)
2017-05-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2017-05-25SenateRescind Vote Sub for S2662 (38-0) (Allen)
2017-05-25SenateSubstituted for S2662
2017-01-30SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-01-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (69-0-0)
2017-01-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2662 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4081 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback