NJ A4056 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S2414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S2414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "Massage and Bodywork Therapist Licensing Act" to require certain class study and examination requirements.
Title
Revises "Massage and Bodywork Therapist Licensing Act" to require certain class study and examination requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted by S2414 |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2414 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.56.