NJ A4016 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2089
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises penalties for drunk driving and ignition interlock device violations.
Title
Revises penalties for drunk driving and ignition interlock device violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4016 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2447 (Same As) 2016-09-08 - Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2447 (Same As) 2016-09-08 - Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee