NJ A3945 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.54.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends eligibility for accidental disability and accidental death benefits to certain PFRS, SPRS and PERS members who contract COVID-19 and test positive for SARS-CoV-2.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends eligibility for accidental disability and accidental death benefits to certain PFRS, SPRS and PERS members who contract COVID-19 and test positive for SARS-CoV-2.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2430 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.54.
2020-06-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2020-06-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-06-29SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-06-29SenateSubstituted for S2430 (SCS)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-25SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-05-14SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2020-05-14AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (80-0-0)
2020-05-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-05-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-04-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2430 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A3945 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback