NJ A3918 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S2276 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07AssemblySubstituted by S2276 (2R)
2017-06-29AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio)
2016-10-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-06-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2276 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback