NJ S2276 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S592
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.*
Title
Modifies State's solar renewable energy portfolio standards.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3918 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3918 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-21-0) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A3918 (1R) |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-12) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2276 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-8)
A3918 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S2276 (2R)
A3918 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S2276 (2R)