NJ A3904 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits use of virtual or remote instruction to meet minimum 180-day school year requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Permits use of virtual or remote instruction to meet minimum 180-day school year requirement under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2337 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2337 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.27. |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (80-0-0) |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2337 |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Cardinale) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2337 (Same As) 2020-04-13 - Substituted by A3904 (1R)