NJ A3901 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits professional and occupational licensing boards to reactivate licensure of certain individuals during state of emergency or public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits professional and occupational licensing boards to reactivate licensure of certain individuals during state of emergency or public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2334 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-14AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.25.
2020-04-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2020-04-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-04-13SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-04-13SenateSubstituted for S2334
2020-04-13SenateSenate Amendment (Voice) (Pou)
2020-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-03-23AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S2334 (Same As) 2020-04-13 - Substituted by A3901 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback