NJ A3785 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pay educational costs of students who reside in homeless shelter outside district of residence for more than one year.
Title
Requires State to pay educational costs of students who reside in homeless shelter outside district of residence for more than one year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2396 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.83. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2396 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-1) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2396 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3785