NJ S2396 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3785
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A3785
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to pay educational costs of students who reside in homeless shelter outside district of residence for more than one year.
Title
Requires State to pay educational costs of students who reside in homeless shelter outside district of residence for more than one year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3785 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3785 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.83.