NJ A3744 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-26 - Approved P.L.2016, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-26 - Approved P.L.2016, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes law enforcement assisted addiction and recovery referral programs.*
Title
Establishes law enforcement assisted addiction and recovery referral programs.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2330 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2330 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.58. |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-2) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2330 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-2-4) |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2330 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A3744