NJ A373 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2592

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.150.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires life imprisonment without parole for persons convicted of the murder of a minor under the age of 18 in the course of the commission of a sex crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires life imprisonment without parole for persons convicted of the murder of a minor under the age of 18 in the course of the commission of a sex crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S607 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.150.
2017-06-22SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
2017-06-22SenateSubstituted for S607 (1R)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (69-0-0)
2016-10-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2592 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S607 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A373 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback