NJ S607 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S336

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A373 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires life imprisonment without parole for persons convicted of the murder of a minor under the age of 18 in the course of the commission of a sex crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires life imprisonment without parole for persons convicted of the murder of a minor under the age of 18 in the course of the commission of a sex crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateSubstituted by A373 (1R)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S336 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A373 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.150.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback