NJ A3693 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2162
Note: Carry Foward to future S2881
Note: Carry Over of previous A5569
Note: Carry Over of previous S3840
Note: Carry Foward to future S2881
Note: Carry Over of previous A5569
Note: Carry Over of previous S3840
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county vocational school districts to establish electric vehicle certification programs.
Title
Authorizes county vocational school districts to establish electric vehicle certification programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3693 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3693 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2086 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5569 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3840 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3693 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2086 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5569 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3840 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3693 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4000/3693_I1.HTM |